WELCOME HALL EVANGELICAL CHURCH, CATSHILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith, Doctrinal Distinctives and Ethical Statements, primarily, but not exclusively, within Bromsgrove and the surrounding neighbourhood; and such other charitable purposes as shall, in the opinion of the charity trustees, put into practice the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 March 2019: CIO registration
- 14 September 2021: Funds received from 1148646 WELCOME HALL EVANGELICAL CHURCH, CATSHILL
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMUEL DAVID JACK | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Guille | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHRISTOPHER WELLS | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Jeremy Brooks | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £973.36k | £321.11k | £183.60k | £243.78k | £181.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.83k | £189.09k | £224.19k | £213.60k | £160.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £202.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £770.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £154.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN BROMSGROVE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AS SHALL IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OF OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THIER YOUTH. AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THIER CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Woodrow Lane
Catshill
BROMSGROVE
B61 0PU
- Phone:
- 01527758609
- Email:
- office@welcomehallchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window