NEW BEGINNINGS READING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free All Day Cafe, Community Fridge and Hot Meal Service, serving the most vulnerable in Reading, Berkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Reading
Governance
- 10 May 2017: CIO registration
- NEW BEGINNINGS READIN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Helen Arnold | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Justin James Duncan | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Wigmore | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Matthew Wood | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Lloyd | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Beisly | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ruth Hephzibah Thake | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.11k | £78.38k | £86.42k | £82.25k | £130.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.59k | £78.84k | £107.92k | £126.54k | £119.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.00k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 November 2023 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 May 2017 as amended on 01 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PERSONS IN READING WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC REASONS REGARDLESS OF THEIR RELIGION OR BELIEF BY PROVIDING WARMTH, FOOD AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS, TEMPORARY SHORT TO MID-TERM AND OVERNIGHT ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS TO ACCESS OTHER LONG TERM SERVICES DESIGNED TO HELP THEM BECOME SELF-SUFFICIENT. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE IN READING FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS; UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL HEALTH (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL OR DRUGS; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME, (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Queens Arms
Great Knollys Street
READING
RG1 7HL
- Phone:
- 07421998208
- Website:
-
newbeginningsreading.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window