THE STABLES EVENTS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. the promotion of arts and culture, particularly, but not exclusively, by promoting and facilitating access to, and participation in, festivals, events and performances of music and other cultural activities by AND FOR persons of all ages and social backgrounds, and 2. the advancement of education in the arts, particularly, but not exclusively, the art of music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 June 2018: Standard registration
- 27 September 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1178665 THE STABLES THEATRE LIMITED
- IF: MILTON KEYNES INTERNATIONAL FESTIVAL (Working name)
- MILTON KEYNES INTERNATIONAL FESTIVAL (Working name)
- THE STABLES (Working name)
- THE STABLES EVENTS LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27m | £348.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23m | £394.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £294.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £878.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £254.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £138.07k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.21m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £23.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 DEC 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 APR 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 1) THE PROMOTION OF ARTS AND CULTURE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING ACCESS TO, AND PARTICIPATION IN, FESTIVALS, EVENTS AND PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC AND OTHER CULTURAL ACTIVITIES BY AND FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES AND SOCIAL BACKGROUNDS, AND 2)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ART OF MUSIC.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window