Financial history WISDOM OF EQUUS

Charity number: 1175736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.86k £2.79k £12.03k £4.21k £5.18k
Total expenditure £7.18k £3.28k £7.13k £7.50k £3.66k
Income from government contracts £8.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £975