EAST MOUNTAIN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
East Mountain UK exists to develop Christian leaders for global mission service. It is a Community of people who love Jesus and are passionate about teaching, developing and empowering leaders. We are working to establish a place where leaders grow- spiritually, biblically and practically in their leadership skills. Partnership & impacting our communities through the Gospel of Christ are key.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Havering
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Brian Seithel | Chair | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Brenda Lay Yen Bell | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Bell | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FURR | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/05/2020 | 05/05/2021 | 05/05/2022 | 05/05/2023 | 05/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £655 | £356 | £106 | £1.33k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299 | £299 | £0 | £100 | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 May 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 May 2021 | 23 June 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2021 | 23 June 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 May 2020 | 26 April 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 May 2020 | 26 April 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 WOODMAN ROAD
WARLEY
BRENTWOOD
CM14 5AZ
- Phone:
- 01277211480
- Email:
- gary.seithel@uwm.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window