FRIENDS OF HONEYWOOD MUSEUM

Charity number: 1175789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Friends of Honeywood Museum raise funds to support Honeywood Museum and to encourage as many people as possible to take an interest in the local history of the area. The Friends help to pay for additional items to support the work of the museum. We organise regular illustrated talks on all aspects of local history as well as other family events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,503
Total expenditure: £21,667

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2017: CIO registration
  • 11 December 2018: Funds received from 1067131 FRIENDS OF HONEYWOOD MUSEUM
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill Leonie Whitehead Trustee 23 June 2022
JEWISH GENEALOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Christopher Alan Ford Trustee 19 February 2020
COLLINGWOOD SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
John Phillips Trustee 16 May 2019
CARSHALTON OLD RECTORY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ANTHONY ANDREW PRICE Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
SUSAN CHRISTINE HOSKIN Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
JEANNETTE MYRTA CROSIER Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Christopher Patrick Cartwright Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Lucy Jane Victoria Kelsall Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.90k £6.08k £11.76k £18.52k £16.50k
Total expenditure £15.14k £5.51k £8.42k £15.35k £21.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £870 N/A N/A £800 £1.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 5
31 Camden Road
SUTTON
Surrey
SM1 2SH
Phone:
07703220526