THE DYMCHURCH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is available to hire on a regular or non-regular basis. There is a large main hall with a large fully equipped kitchen and a smaller room with tea/coffee making facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 12 September 2017: CIO registration
- 08 January 2020: Funds received from 290817 THE DYMCHURCH VILLAGE HALL
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Charles Davis | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN ANDREW | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET ANDREW | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
TERRY PRESTON | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
DIANA WIMBLE | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Adrian Goodsell | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.98k | £26.73k | £23.68k | £16.68k | £23.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.36k | £15.25k | £17.82k | £62.15k | £10.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.19k | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF DYMCHURCH IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND THE SURROUNDING PARISHES (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dymchurch Village Hall
Orgarswick Avenue
Dymchurch
Romney Marsh
TN29 0NX
- Phone:
- 01303873580
- Email:
- diana.wimble@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window