Financial history YOUTH EMPLOYMENT STRATEGY PARTNERSHIP (YES)

Charity number: 1175126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.80k £0 £9.80k £2.00k £20.25k
Total expenditure £10.83k £0 £5.79k £12.12k £17.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.15k N/A N/A N/A N/A