Financial history POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL/POLSKA SZKOLA SOBOTNIA MILFORD IM. TADEUSZA CZUCHNICKIEGO

Charity Number: 1175719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £50.86k £42.71k £66.25k £71.26k £67.46k
Total expenditure £30.95k £46.34k £49.22k £52.19k £59.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A