DERBY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold around 9 free public events a year:- Talks, recitals, visits to see, hear, study & play (mostly church) organs locally, one visit to a distant major venue (fare charged). We work with schools to interest children in organs/music. We recruit members to support our work, we're affiliated to the national body, the I.A.O., which runs U.K. events & offers bursaries (www.iao.org.uk).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 13 January 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Binns | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Shepherd | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Westerman | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Storer | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Maxwell-Jones | Trustee | 09 September 2013 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN CHATTO | Trustee |
|
||||||
DENIS ANTHONY LITTLETON BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR L T ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £103.19k | £2.26k | £3.90k | £3.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59k | £4.38k | £21.18k | £29.00k | £8.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 1991. as amended on 15 Nov 1999 as amended on 18 Nov 2008 as amended on 14 Feb 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE PUBLIC OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC,WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO ORGAN MUSIC. TO FACILITATE THE ACHIEVEMENT OF SUCH SUBJECT,THE ASSOCIATION MAY ARRANGE AND PRESENT:(I)PUBLIC LECTURES,DISSCUSSIONS AND DEBATES ON THIS PROJECT,(II)PUBLIC DEMONSTRATIONS OF INSTRUMENTS,(III)PUBLIC DEMONSTRATIONS OF MUSIC FOR ORGAN,(IV)OPEN COMPETITIONS FOR PLAYING AND COMPOSITION OF ORGAN MUSIC,(V)PUBLIC MEETINGS TO FACILITATE THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND VIEWS WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND PERSONS CONCERNED WITH THE COMPOSITION,INTERPRETATION,PRESENTATION,TEACHING OR PUBLICATION OF ORGAN MUSIC,(VI)ADVICE TO PERFORMERS,TEACHERS,STUDENTS,CHURCHMEN OR OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ON ANY MATTER CONCERNED WITH THE ASSOCIATION'S OBJECT.THE ASSOCIATION MAY ALSO DO SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF ITS OBJECT.
Area of benefit
DERBY CITY, DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 GUIDE POST
NETHER HEAGE
BELPER
DE56 2AQ
- Phone:
- 01773853635
- Email:
- ddoatreasurer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window