Financial history SALFORD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 510583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £24.29k £7.06k £43.38k £35.32k £36.91k
Total expenditure £20.39k £15.98k £38.62k £35.69k £36.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A