ROTHERHAM SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rotherham Samaritans was formed for the purpose of working for the assistance of persons who are suicidal, despairing or in distress in and around Rotherham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £31,053
Total expenditure: £33,005

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Rotherham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SAMARITANS OF ROTHERHAM (Working name)
  • THE SAMARITANS (ROTHERHAM BRANCH) (Working name)
  • THE SAMARITANS OF ROTHERHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francis David Pinder Chair 19 November 2021
None on record
Lisa Bingham Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Sallie Higgins Trustee 21 May 2024
None on record
Andrew Scott Trustee 22 March 2023
None on record
Stephen Wilson Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Mark Smith Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
John Glynn Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
FIONA WILSON Trustee 08 September 2020
ROTHERHAM AND DEARNE VALLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
HOLY TRINITY THORPE HESLEY (ANGLICAN & METHODIST)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.76k £28.74k £23.00k £28.48k £31.05k
Total expenditure £26.90k £40.83k £19.89k £29.87k £33.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.25k £15.00k £20.00k £25.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 29/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN ROTHERHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
ROTHERHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 29 July 1996 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
22 PERCY STREET
ROTHERHAM
S65 1ED
Phone:
07778963979
Website:

No information available