Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SALISBURY PLAIN

Charity number: 1173846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £112.28k £93.87k £108.24k £107.82k £127.53k
Total expenditure £194.33k £89.05k £132.29k £149.85k £114.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.88k £1.14k £3.11k £1.00k £2.85k