JOSEPH COWEN LIFELONG LEARNING CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Joseph Cowen Lifelong Learning Centre (JCLLC) aims to deliver and promote adult education in the north-east of England. This is achieved through the provision of the Explore Lifelong Learning programme of short courses and lectures of a high academic standard. Further details about JCLLC and Explore can be found here: http://www.weareexplore.org.uk/ http://www.josephcowen.org.uk/
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 01 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Robert Grady | Chair | 10 May 2018 |
|
|||||||
Justin Valentine Pearce | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Prof Trevor Buck | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley Pringle | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthea Lang | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rita Prabhu | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Simon David Pallett | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jo Campion | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr DOROTHY STAINSBY | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Louise Freeman | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.06k | £48.41k | £43.47k | £41.88k | £44.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.90k | £33.20k | £38.13k | £47.84k | £46.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Aug 2017 as amended on 03 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY THE PROVISION OF SHORT COURSES, SEMINARS, STUDY GROUPS, LECTURES AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essell Accountants Ltd
29 Howard Street
NORTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE30 1AR
- Phone:
- 01912611633
- Email:
- weareexplore@gmail.com
- Website:
-
weareexplore.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window