Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN NELSON

Charity number: 1174213
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70.78k £87.15k £85.05k £62.81k £74.56k
Total expenditure £70.00k £59.26k £93.32k £83.07k £69.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.77k £46.06k £59.70k £33.90k £22.56k