NORTHAMPTON SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1174013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist people who are suicidal, despairing, in distress or in need of emotional support. To do so the branch provides a 24 hours a day telephone service and an email; and face to face service to enable people to receive immediate help and support whenever required. The branch also runs a Charity Shop and engages in other activities to enable it to meet its objectives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £88,522
Total expenditure: £89,426

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Lindsay Chair 29 June 2022
None on record
Stephen Michael Broadbent Trustee 24 June 2024
EPTA - EUROPEAN PIANO TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time
BOUGHTON PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
Lisa Richardson Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
Joanne Malpass Trustee 18 September 2022
None on record
Michelle Connor Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Desmond Mold Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Margaret Riley Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.32k £73.07k £75.35k £70.13k £88.52k
Total expenditure £56.23k £48.02k £56.48k £68.30k £89.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.89k £397 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 2005, AS AMENDED 21 APRIL 2006 AND 6 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS OF THE AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE OF WORKING UNDER DIRECTION: AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND (II) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 04 November 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 St. Michaels Avenue
Northampton
NN1 4JQ
Phone:
01604636747