KINGSCARE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KingsCare League of Friends is a Devon based patient support group that runs a wide range of activities and support services for those in need within the Newton Abbot area with the aid of volunteers eg volunteer car service to medical appointments and social activities, befriending, social groups, carer support, exercise groups, benefits advice, advocacy, shopping.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £123,643 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miriam Perrin | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Clifford Patrick | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Barker | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert George Holliday | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Rollason | Trustee | 19 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WICKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.90k | £482.31k | £176.19k | £304.01k | £311.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.03k | £330.42k | £155.72k | £342.28k | £319.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £137.63k | £145.07k | N/A | £104.24k | £123.64k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.91k | £22.69k | £91.13k | £55.68k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF KINGSCARE SHALL BE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS REGISTERED AT KINGSTEIGNTON MEDICAL PRACTICE AND, IN ADDITION, TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THOSE IN NEED WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY. THIS INCLUDES THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSTEIGNTON MEDICAL PRACTICE
WHITEWAY ROAD
KINGSTEIGNTON
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 3HN
- Phone:
- 01626357090
- Email:
- kingscare.l83004@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window