Financial history LAUNCESTON REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1178812
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.91k £3.48k £5.73k £7.96k £3.61k
Total expenditure £12.61k £4.35k £10.84k £7.53k £5.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A