Financial history FAITH IN KIDS

Charity Number: 1176335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £218.25k £185.22k £296.34k £335.28k £475.07k
Total expenditure £111.62k £186.21k £270.58k £323.94k £415.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A