GREENWICH MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Greenwich Music School is a centre of excellence in music education, delivering lessons to children and adults through a range of instrument and voice lessons, group courses and ensembles, an early years department, professional training and special projects. GMS delivers training for music teachers, and advocates for the value of learning music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephan Solomonidis | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pickering | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yun Zheng | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Stockley | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN ROUS | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HILL | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUCY BEVERIDGE | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.04k | £242.90k | £305.31k | £382.26k | £458.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.33k | £216.60k | £284.03k | £388.47k | £476.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £12.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN GREENWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VANBRUGH STUDIO
137 VANBRUGH HILL
GREENWICH
LONDON
SE10 9HP
- Phone:
- 02083051286
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window