FRIENDS OF WOODBRIDGE LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Woodbridge Library organise events and activities in accordance with our charitable objectives and raise funds in support of these objectives. Music, theatre and literature-based events are held throughout the year aimed at both adult and children in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara De Vita | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Mary Railton Jones | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bull | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Webber | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE SCRIVENER | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAY YULE | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lynam | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gartley | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY CORNFORD | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Rogers | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.70k | £660 | £2.24k | £11.54k | £13.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.10k | £1.21k | £3.56k | £2.59k | £3.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | £600 | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Jan 2018 as amended on 15 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE USE OF WOODBRIDGE LIBRARRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF WOODBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O WOODBRIDGE LIBRARY
NEW STREET
WOODBRIDGE
- Phone:
- 01394446510
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window