Financial history LEICESTER GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 510809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.75m £18.21m £19.40m £21.42m £23.49m
Total expenditure £16.49m £17.06m £18.15m £19.81m £22.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £355.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £374.13k £126.13k £29.69k £65.21k £374.43k
Income - Other trading activities £73.65k £0 £38.97k £0 £1.47m
Income - Charitable activities £16.30m £18.06m £19.32m £21.25m £0
Income - Endowments £18.72k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £7.38k £5.30k £108.82k £134.24k
Income - Other £0 £21.43k £0 £0 £147.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.45m £17.06m £18.15m £19.81m £22.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.72k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.75m £18.48k £0 £0 £2.81m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £26.57k £0 £0 £0 £0