THE THAME MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education by the establishment and maintenance of a museum in local history and in particular, but not exclusively, to Thame and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,654 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 September 2017: CIO registration
- 03 July 2019: Funds received from 1125432 THE THAME MUSEUM TRUST
- THAME MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Dite | Chair | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Philip John Glover | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parsons | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Trevor Watkins | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Petrova Caldecourt | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Stevens | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Weimers | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cowell | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Linda Emery | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
MAURICE KIRTLAND | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LAURENCE DYER | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
PHILIP WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.97k | £46.70k | £30.62k | £42.93k | £30.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.77k | £15.00k | £19.49k | £33.58k | £38.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.07k | £39.86k | £16.00k | £270 | £3.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Sep 2017 as amended on 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN LOCAL HISTORY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO THAME AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thame Museum
79 High Street
THAME
Oxfordshire
OX9 3AE
- Phone:
- 01844 212801
- Email:
- info@thamemuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window