ALYN MISSION AREA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities with all ages across the community to promote the Christian Gospel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 15 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Huw Butler | Chair | 06 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Kevin Mark Holmes | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Bebb | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Paul Smith | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Zara Jarvis | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Reed | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harry Reed | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Edwards | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MENNA STORY | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Veronica Partington | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|||||
COLIN GRANVILLE BROWN | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM HATTON | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIAN MORFYDD HATTON JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Roden | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ELIZABETH BELLIS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA VICTORIA ELLIS-BRERETON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA WOOLRICH | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN TILSTON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £450.30k | £394.78k | £446.92k | £426.94k | £323.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £414.79k | £409.24k | £426.74k | £402.27k | £381.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £8.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAR 1920
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL, IN THE PARISH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The New Vicarage
First Avenue
Llay
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL12 0TN
- Phone:
- 01978 854755
- Email:
- huwbutler@cinw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window