Financial history TOGETHER LEICESTER

Charity Number: 1175357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £116.30k £69.52k £55.25k £75.94k £75.80k
Total expenditure £41.81k £115.10k £70.27k £55.45k £72.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k N/A