Financial history RIVER LARK CATCHMENT PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1177318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £19.51k £20.03k £19.97k £48.83k £50.31k
Total expenditure £18.99k £14.52k £21.09k £52.80k £41.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.51k £18.00k £17.97k £11.07k £17.35k