Trustees LOUTH CHURCHES FOR REFUGEES

Charity number: 1177536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maxwell Thomas Wilson Trustee 29 April 2025
None on record
BRYAN ROBERT UTTERIDGE Trustee 19 March 2024
EAST LINCOLNSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Julie Rebecca Markham Trustee 05 September 2022
None on record
Rosamond Marjorie Malyon Trustee 27 July 2021
None on record
ANDREW WEST Trustee 16 December 2020
None on record