CHURCH INVESTORS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
How we work: - By encouraging the formulation of investment policies based on Christian ethical principles and assisting each other in putting such policies into practice - for instance by publishing research. - By encouraging responsible business practices through engagement with company managements. - By sharing information and views on ethical matters related to investment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 July 2018: Standard registration
- CIG, THE CHURCH INVESTORS GROUP (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Geoffrey Land Millar | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Frederick Neale | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Richard Harper | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Edward John Barrie | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Bridget Micklem | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Barnabas Blyth | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
OLE-WILHELM MEYER | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN TREVOR BEER | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPH RAINER WILHELM FLAD | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAOLO CAMOLETTO | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.73k | £43.99k | £46.24k | £47.47k | £64.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.15k | £28.61k | £51.93k | £51.01k | £53.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ETHICAL INVESTMENT AND ETHICAL BUSINESS PRACTICE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SO AS TO ADVANCE: (A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B)THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (C)COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW AND ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT; AND (D)SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY BE EFFECTIVELY ADVANCED BY SUCH PROMOTION WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A)THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; AND (B)THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND EFFECTS OF ETHICAL INVESTMENT, ETHICAL BUSINESS PRACTICE AND SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN EACH CASE, IN A MANNER WHICH DRAWS UPON AND REFLECTS THE BODY OF CHRISTIAN ETHICAL PRINCIPLES DERIVED FROM THE BELIEFS AND TRADITIONS OF THE DIFFERENT CHRISTIAN DENOMINATIONS; SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C C L A INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LTD
1 Angel Lane
London
EC4R 3AB
- Phone:
- 02074896067
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window