Financial history ABRAHAM'S OASIS UK

Charity number: 1176951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.69k £27.06k £16.34k £16.47k £14.85k
Total expenditure £8.10k £22.34k £88 £38.25k £12.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A