Financial history THE GATESHEAD JEWISH NURSERY

Charity Number: 511204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.33m £1.32m £1.27m £1.51m £1.49m
Total expenditure £1.17m £1.13m £1.27m £1.62m £1.48m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £714.73k £783.96k £702.38k £614.70k £810.09k
Income - Donations and legacies £189.70k £123.16k £52.36k £46.91k £60.97k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £280.18k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.20m £1.22m £1.18m £1.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.13m £1.27m £1.39m £1.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £234.10k £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.50k £7.50k £9.60k £11.07k £10.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £10.45k £4.42k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0