FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH (CARMARTHEN)

Charity Number: 1175517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE FRIENDS WAS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF ST PETER'S CHURCH AND ITS GROUNDS. WE OFFER A MEMBERSHIP TO INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES, CORPORATE AND LIFE MEMBERSHIP. THE COMMITTEE ALSO ARRANGE EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, FAYRES, CONCERTS AND HISTORY EVENTS TO RAISE FUNDS FOR ST PETER'S CHURCH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,580
Total expenditure: £342

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire
  • Ceredigion
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 November 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Coralie Mary Steel Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
Glynis Dawn Morris Trustee 06 March 2023
None on record
The Venerable Matthew Hill Trustee 09 January 2019
THE WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND DEPENDANTS SOCIETY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.50k £3.16k £5.34k £1.90k £1.58k
Total expenditure £12.28k £3.64k £4.06k £1.13k £342
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o 6 Ael y Bryn
Tanerdy
CARMARTHEN
SA31 2HB
Phone:
07398587018
Website:

No information available