SURREY HEATH AGE CONCERN CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An independent charity working to enhance the lives of older people in Surrey Heath borough. Current activities include: a visiting & befriending service, The Rainbow Cafe, a community cafe in Camberley town centre, Tea & Chatter tea parties for the over 70s across Surrey Heath, Tea & Memories weekly vintage tea parties at The Rainbow Cafe and weekly seated exercise class at Places Leisure Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
112 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
- 30 April 2019: Funds received from 273316 SHAC (SURREY HEATH AGE CONCERN)
- SHAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES WILLIAM BARBOR | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Francis Garrett | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Raymond Amphlett | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathon Scott Allard Lytle | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Lewis | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Greatbatch | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.26k | £78.19k | £60.96k | £66.01k | £91.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.70k | £55.91k | £65.07k | £90.89k | £92.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £41.13k | £27.50k | £10.90k | £11.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE ELDERLY IN SURREY HEATH BY ANY MEANS WHICH IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Surrey Heath Age Concern CIO
Unit 2F Station House
1 Pembroke Broadway
Camberley
Surrey
GU15 3XD
- Phone:
- 01276 748882
- Email:
- manager@sh-ac.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window