MYELOPATHY.ORG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting and funding scientific research into all aspects of myelopathy and ensuring the useful results are publicly disseminated. Raising awareness and understanding of myelopathy. Supporting and promoting improved physical and mental outcomes for patients and supporting patients, carers and healthcare professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 06 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Wood | Chair | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rory Murphy | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aditya Vedantam | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benjamin Davies | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Czick | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eldrid Herrington | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Smith | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Lloyd Sadler | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sun-Schuster | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr MARK KOTTER | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.73k | £123.28k | £81.61k | £79.22k | £74.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.87k | £75.35k | £82.34k | £97.41k | £75.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH AND EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF MYELOPATHY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. SUPPORTING AND FUNDING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF MYELOPATHY AND ENSURING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLICLY DISSEMINATED; 2. RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONDITION IN ALL ITS FORMS INCLUDING SHARING CURRENT RESEARCH AND HEALTHCARE INFORMATION; 3. SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING IMPROVED PHYSICAL AND MENTAL OUTCOMES FOR PATIENTS INCLUDING ESTABLISHING SUPPORTING FOR PATIENTS, CARERS AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lakin Rose Ltd
Oakington Road
Girton
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0QH
- Phone:
- 01223748405
- Email:
- info@myelopathy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window