Financial history EVA'S ANGELS

Charity number: 1178612
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.52k £57.20k £30.13k £38.20k £40.26k
Total expenditure £33.60k £42.80k £52.17k £59.72k £36.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A