Financial history EMMANUEL CHURCH, EASTBOURNE

Charity number: 1177439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £427.72k £900.92k £1.92m £391.90k £889.65k
Total expenditure £760.84k £1.07m £1.91m £1.69m £326.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £854.47k £1.87m N/A £816.61k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.90k £4.82k N/A £12.13k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £43.20k £44.89k N/A £48.03k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £1.31k £529 N/A £9.26k
Income - Other N/A £49 £2.21k N/A £3.63k
Income - Legacies N/A £150.58k £10.80k N/A £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £171.96k £191.80k N/A £286.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.59k £7.87k N/A £4.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £4.17k £3.17k N/A £11.83k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £894.98k £1.72m N/A £39.68k