Trustees EMPIRE THEATRE TRUST CIO

Charity Number: 1178975
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Duncan Robert McCubbine Mr Trustee 07 November 2024
EARLS COLNE RECREATION CHARITY
Recently registered
Karen Pearce Trustee 28 October 2023
None on record
Linda Kemp Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
Andy Munday Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
NEIL KEITH HARDY Trustee 31 August 2016
None on record