BHS KOLLEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 02 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVI RATZERSDORFER | Chair | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
MEIR SHLOMO ITZINGER | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
JULIAN JUDAH SCHARFER | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.67k | £98.23k | £172.17k | £102.70k | £240.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.76k | £89.06k | £98.08k | £164.13k | £196.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY ESTABLISHING MANAGING AND SUPPORTING A LEARNING CENTRE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT KNOWN AS BHS KOLLEL IN NORTH WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 GRESHAM GARDENS
LONDON
NW11 8PB
- Phone:
- 07969812379
- Email:
- avi4rz@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window