Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN YR ENFYS

Charity number: 1177583
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.46k £56.03k £59.61k £58.42k £48.68k
Total expenditure £38.65k £38.86k £62.58k £57.08k £57.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.38k £36.32k £42.80k £41.73k £33.34k