Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE DIVINE, WEST WORTHING

Charity number: 1178660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £189.55k £147.12k £134.80k £145.05k £182.60k
Total expenditure £162.47k £148.48k £124.25k £138.50k £169.52k
Income from government contracts N/A £73.12k £65.66k £73.76k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £898 N/A N/A N/A