Trustees Newbury Soup Kitchen

Charity Number: 1179298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Jeremy Tillyer Chair 09 August 2024
None on record
Sian Mary Orton Trustee 06 March 2025
None on record
Julie Campbell Trustee 01 December 2023
THATCHAM UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Received: On time
Bridget Eastwood Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Rebecca Dunn Trustee 31 October 2022
None on record
Brynn Marie Holmes Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Stephanie Langley Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record