WOODLOES PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A community centre for use by various groups and organisations to enhance the lives of people on Woodloes Park. Regular users include - Senior Citizens, Mothers and Toddlers, Townswomens Guild, Weight Watchers, Belly Dancing, Pilates, Community Choir, Youth Theatre, Youth Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 03 November 1981: Standard registration
- WOODLOES PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY NEALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kevin Hancock | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA PINK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.09k | £2.29k | £5.39k | £6.17k | £5.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.29k | £5.23k | £5.18k | £5.45k | £6.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22 JANUARY 1979
Charitable objects
TO BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF PERSON RESIDENT ON THE WOODLEAS PARK ESTATE INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WOODLOES PARK ESTATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CRANE CLOSE
WARWICK
CV34 5HB
- Phone:
- 01926498742
- Email:
- sheila.pink@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window