VAGINA MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain a museum dedicated to the gynaecological anatomy and its place in science, culture, society and history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Venus | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Claire Mead | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claye Bowler | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pollyanna Cohen | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Joyce | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Harman | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.98k | £148.67k | £117.29k | £183.01k | £258.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.42k | £159.34k | £121.26k | £132.60k | £252.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.32k | £72.67k | £29.23k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM AND COLLECTIONS FOCUSED ON GYNAECOLOGICAL ANATOMY AND ITS PLACE IN SCIENCE, CULTURE, SOCIETY AND HISTORY. 2.SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
275-276 Railway Arches
Poyser Street
LONDON
E2 9RF
- Phone:
- 0333 222 4445
- Email:
- info@vaginamuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window