PAKISTAN ALLIANCE FOR GIRLS EDUCATION UK

Charity number: 1185727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pakistan Alliance for Girls Education promotes Girls Education in Pakistan through Advocacy, Policy, Resource mobilisation and targeted programs to support young girls and women coming from deprived backgrounds facing various challenges including poverty, culture and lack of access to education and personal development opportunities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023

Total income: £40,946
Total expenditure: £81,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Pakistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 October 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • PAGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mohammed Kassim Gaffar Chair 07 September 2022
PRISONERS' ADVICE SERVICE
Received: On time
Shumaila Kisat Trustee 11 February 2024
None on record
Ayub Jamil Dosani Trustee 20 November 2022
None on record
NADIA BUKHARI Trustee 20 May 2018
None on record
SUNIYA QURESHI Trustee 20 May 2018
UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATION FOR MEDICAL AID TO PAKISTAN
Received: On time
LEARNING FOR LIFE UK LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £94.00k £81.00k £139.30k £40.95k
Total expenditure £125.00k £101.00k £99.85k £81.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
211a
peel house
34-44 london road
211
morden
MORDEN
Phone:
0013127158061