LEO COMPUTERS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect the history and legacy of LEO computers by collecting artefacts and memorabilia, first-hand memories both oral and written and compiling a catalogue of such material; and, by working with our members, with museums and archives to protect this heritage and promote it to the public at large and to researchers through events, exhibitions, publications and an accessible online archive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 28 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GRAHAM BYFORD | Chair | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anthony Cleary | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL DAINES | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|||||
John Francois Paschoud | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH MICHAEL NEVILLE LYONS | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY JANE TRESMAN CAMINER | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD ROY BEHR | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT BODSWORTH | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.55k | £2.12k | £1.97k | £5.04k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.52k | £1.26k | £892 | £3.07k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 November 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF LEO, THE WORLD'S FIRST BUSINESS COMPUTER, AND SUBSEQUENT AND RELATED COMPUTING MACHINES PRODUCED BY LEO COMPUTERS LTD AND SUCCESSOR COMPANIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 CLARENCE ROAD
TEDDINGTON
TW11 0BW
- Phone:
- 02089772779
- Website:
-
leo-computers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window