THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, COTTENHAM

Charity number: 1177838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide buildings and facilities for religious services and conduct religious ceremonies. We offer pastoral care and education. We engage in ministry to our church community and also to the wider community, working with children in our primary school and older people whether living independently or in residential accommodation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £87,559
Total expenditure: £112,491

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALL SAINTS COTTENHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Lynda Davies Chair 01 October 2017
CHURCH AND CAUSEWAY ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF DR JOHN FITZ WILLIAM FOR THE CHURCH
Received: On time
CHARITY OF DR JOHN FITZ WILLIAM FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
TOWN LANDS ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY
Received: On time
RAMPTON TOWN LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
COTTENHAM CHARITIES
Received: On time
CHARITY OF DR JOHN FITZ WILLIAM (ESTATE CHARITY)
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
Dr Judith Sara Shelley Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Gavin Iain Ferguson Cameron Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Matthew John Unwin-Riches Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Cheryl Ann Lowe Trustee 04 April 2018
None on record
Alison Phyllis Wedgbury Trustee 04 April 2018
None on record
VERENA SUSAN MACY HOOKS Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BURMAN LOWE Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
EDWARD CHARLES KRAMER Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
PAULINE LESLEY MAILE Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Frances Mary Horgan Trustee 01 April 2016
NEW CAMBRIDGE SINGERS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £157.15k £109.93k £105.95k £102.17k £87.56k
Total expenditure £213.58k £138.28k £124.60k £121.39k £112.49k
Income from government contracts N/A £785 £1.14k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.33k £1.33k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2024 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 August 2024 287 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 High Street
Cottenham
Cambridge
CB24 8SA
Phone:
01954583651
Email:
No information available