Financial history DEAN FOREST RAILWAY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 1178157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.92k £3.45k £4.47k £5.18k £27.18k
Total expenditure £5.47k £5.64k £4.87k £6.93k £20.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A