ADBASTON COMMUNITY CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society organises four or five concerts each year in the church of St Michael & All Angels, Adbaston, Staffordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 05 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE ROWLAND KERRIDGE MA CEng | Chair | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Violet Carver | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Trafford | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Hodgson B.Ed | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW STEPHEN BROOKS | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|||||
ROGER SAVAGE | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £335 | £2.44k | £7.29k | £5.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.05k | £140 | £1.40k | £6.82k | £6.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF, AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shukers Croft
New Inn Bank
Bishops Offley
STAFFORD
ST21 6HD
- Phone:
- 01785 280373
- Email:
- trafford.pam@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window