Financial history IHSAN COMPASSION FUND

Charity number: 1179784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £87.23k £120.20k £208.35k £163.83k £188.48k
Total expenditure £54.77k £143.41k £133.71k £226.76k £200.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A