DOSE OF NATURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dose of Nature is a mental health charity that promotes the mental health benefits of engaging with the natural world. We offer a 10-week nature prescription to individuals with mental health problems referred to us by their GP. In addition, we deliver wellbeing workshops to non-clinical groups in which participants learn about and experience the benefits of an increased connection with nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £49,600 from 2 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Mark Rowley | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Lucy Gosal | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Seth | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Faisal Islam | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Godden | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Profesor Martin Milton | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amelia Kidd | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEENA BOND | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.22k | £128.10k | £177.68k | £313.54k | £278.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.93k | £91.44k | £133.21k | £238.86k | £348.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £49.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £4.92k | £78.60k | £88.09k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT ENGLAND THROUGH, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF PROGRAMS OF ENGAGEMENT WITH NATURE TO TREAT MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Gloucester Road
RICHMOND
TW9 3BT
- Phone:
- 02083327067
- Email:
- info@doseofnature.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window