THE CO-OPERATIVE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation, protection and improvement for the public benefit, on behalf of the co-operative movement, of 31 Toad Lane, Rochdale and the National Co-operative Archive.The encouragement of the provision of access to and the study of such buildings and objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,411 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 29 August 2018: CIO registration
- 29 July 2021: Funds received from 1121610 THE CO-OPERATIVE HERITAGE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Webster | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Matthews | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jenny Rebecca Laycock | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Hearn | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Davies | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Zenia Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Stephen J Milner | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John William Boyle | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Adderley | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Tanya Noon | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD POWELL | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/10/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £170.96k | £144.30k | £96.31k | £111.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £436.82k | £319.32k | £329.30k | £367.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.67k | £38.70k | £5.17k | £2.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 October 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
3.OBJECTS 3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST AS TO THE INCOME, AND ALL SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AS THE FOUNDER MAY BY NOTICE IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: 3.1.1 THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ON BEHALF OF THE CO-OPERATIVE MOVEMENT OF 31 TOAD LANE, ROCHDALE (KNOWN AS THE ROCHDALE PIONEERS MUSEUM) AND ANY ANCILLARY AND SUCH OTHER BUILDINGS AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CIO OR IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CIO SHALL HAVE ANY INTEREST. 3.1.2 THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ON BEHALF OF THE CO-OPERATIVE MOVEMENT OF ALL FURNITURE, PICTURES, HISTORICAL RECORDS, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, FILMS, PHOTOGRAPHS, OBJET D'ART AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS OF HISTORIC INTEREST ASSOCIATED WITH THE CO-OPERATIVE MOVEMENT THAT FORM THE NATIONAL CO-OPERATIVE ARCHIVE AND THE COLLECTIONS OF THE ROCHDALE PIONEERS MUSEUM OR THAT MAY, AT ANY TIME, BE VESTED IN THE CIO OR IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE CIO SHALL HAVE ANY INTEREST 3.1.3 THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO AND THE STUDY OF SUCH BUILDINGS, LAND, FURNITURE, PICTURES, HISTORICAL RECORDS, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS THAT COMPRISE THE NATIONAL CO-OPERATIVE ARCHIVE AND THE ROCHDALE PIONEERS MUSEUM BY MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC 3.1.4 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CIO AND THE CHARITY COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rochdale Pioneers Museum
31 Toad Lane
ROCHDALE
Lancashire
OL12 0NU
- Phone:
- 07525699868
- Email:
- museum@co-op.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window